Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Astle, Guzzone, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making specified provisions of law that relate to collective bargaining for State employees apply to firefighters for the Martin State Airport at the rank of captain or below who are employed by the Military Department; and altering specified provisions of law that relate to collective bargaining for specified firefighters for the Martin State Airport
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787478/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {787478/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Appropriations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text - Chapter - Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
(   3-101, 3-102, 3-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page