Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Manno, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Robinson, Rosapepe, Young, and Zucker
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing employees on a public work contract to sue to recover the difference between certain prevailing wage rates and the amounts received by the employees; providing that a certain determination by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry does not preclude certain employees from filing a certain action; and providing for the liability of certain contractors and subcontractors under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597371/1
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {597371/1
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597371/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {293126/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-49)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {597371/1 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Astle) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Committee Amendment {597371/1 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {597371/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Floor Amendment {293126/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-49) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page