Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the spouse of a person on trial for a violation of a protective order may be compelled to testify as an adverse witness if the spouse is the petitioner in the proceeding in which the protective order was issued.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1037
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page