Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceeds - Appropriation Percentage and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from 20% to 100%, the percentage of proceeds the Governor is required to appropriate to the Maryland Department of Health from certain proceeds deposited in the General Fund of the State from certain forfeitures for the purpose of funding drug treatment and education programs; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to include in a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly the total amount deposited in the General Fund from certain forfeitures and how the funds were spent.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (131-2)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceeds - Appropriation Percentage and Reporting
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceeds - Appropriation Percentage and Reporting
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (131-2) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceeds - Appropriation Percentage and Reporting
(   12-405, 12-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page