Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Cassilly, Muse, Smith, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations on specified issues related to the classification of and penalties for criminal and civil violations in the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1012
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {598674/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {598674/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judiciary 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page