Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Sponsored by
Senators King and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Pilot Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims to prevent HIV infection for victims of an alleged rape or sexual offense or victims of alleged child sexual abuse; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the program; requiring that a victim of an alleged rape or sexual offense or a victim of alleged child sexual abuse be provided with a full course of treatment and follow-up care for postexposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV infection; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1249
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {598977/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Judiciary
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Text - First - Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {598977/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations Judiciary 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text - Chapter - Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page