Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, King, and Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include a certain amount in the State budget to the Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education for fiscal years 2021 through 2026 to increase the number of green schools in the State; specifying the purposes for which the funds may be used; requiring that an annual evaluation be conducted in calendar years 2022 through 2027 by an independent contractor with experience evaluating environmental programs; requiring that the evaluation examine certain issues and be provided to certain persons; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1366
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399431/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-32)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {399431/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (103-32) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Text - Chapter - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
(   7-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page