Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $114,500 to $124,500 the maximum salary of a register of wills; and providing for the application of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0640
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Register of Wills - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Register of Wills - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-35)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Register of Wills - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Register of Wills - Salary
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Register of Wills - Salary
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (103-35) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Text - Chapter - Register of Wills - Salary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page