Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Kagan, Carter, Guzzone, Lee, Waldstreicher, Washington, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a child conceived by means of assisted reproduction during the marriage of the child's mother with the consent of the mother's spouse is the legitimate child of both spouses for all purposes; providing that a child conceived by means of assisted reproduction after the death of the mother's spouse and using the genetic material of the mother's spouse is the legitimate child of both spouses under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0519
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {828074/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {352218/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-15)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-10)
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {828074/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judiciary Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {352218/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (121-15) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (34-10) 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
(   1-201, 1-201.1, 1-206, 1-208, 1-208.1, 3-108 )
(   5-1001, 5-1005, 5-1027, 5-1028, 5-3B-01, 5-3B-16, 5-3B-17, 5-3B-27 )
(   4-201, 4-208, 4-211, 4-223 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page