Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Bates, Benson, Cassilly, Conway, DeGrange, Eckardt, Ferguson, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Robinson, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, Waugh, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "foster care recipient" for specified tuition waivers to include an individual who resided in an out-of-home placement at the time the individual graduated from high school or successfully completed a GED; and clarifying that the definition of "tuition" includes fees for credit-bearing and noncredit courses.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0462
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Ways and Means 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
(   15-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page