Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge - Student Housing Exemptions PG 439-16
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the areas within which multifamily housing designated as student housing is exempt from the Prince George's County school facilities surcharge; and establishing an exemption from the school facilities surcharge for specified multifamily housing designated as graduate student housing by the City of College Park.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1138
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page