Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalty for certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling; making certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling a civil offense; establishing that adjudication of a violation under a certain provision of the Act is not a criminal conviction for any purpose and does not impose any of the civil disabilities that may result from a criminal conviction; altering certain penalties; authorizing a certain police officer to issue a certain citation under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0113
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-4)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means Judiciary
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {555762/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Ready and Carter)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Ready and Carter)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-4) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Ways and Means Judiciary 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {555762/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Ready and Carter) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Ready and Carter) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Motion Recede (Delegate Walker) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 House Recede 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
(   12-102, 12-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page