Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Registration of Certifying Providers - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission register certain individuals as certifying providers; altering the definition of "written certification" to alter the information that is required to be included and to require that the certification be in the form prescribed by the Commission; authorizing a certifying provider to issue written certificaitons for certain medical conditions; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Registration of Certifying Providers - Repeal
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {538675/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Registration of Certifying Providers - Repeal
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-3301, 13-3304, 13-3305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page