Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before October 1, 2018, certain government agencies and organizations to submit an independent report to the Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth victims of Human Trafficking and the university of Maryland School of Social Work Child Sex Trafficking Initiative; requiring the report to include certain information; requiring the Workgroup to establish a certain subcommittee to consider recommendations on the provision of statewide services for youth victims of human trafficking; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1494
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {797770/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Social Services - Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {797770/1 Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judiciary 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2015, 2016, 2017 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page