Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Discharge of Patients - Emergency Medical Conditions and Extreme Temperatures (Rebecca's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Muse, Madaleno, Oaks, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a hospital from discharging into extreme outdoor temperatures a patient that an employee of the hospital has reason to believe is suffering from an emergency medical condition and lacks certain capacity to seek shelter, without assistance, from the extreme temperatures; providing that a person who violates certain provisions of the Act shall be guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to a fine of up to $5,000 or imprisonment not to exceed 90 days or both; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Hospitals - Discharge of Patients - Emergency Medical Conditions and Extreme Temperatures (Rebecca's Law)
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-308.8 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page