Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Klausmeier)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "qualified distressed county" for purposes of expanding eligibility for certain credits and benefits under the More Jobs for Marylanders Program to include certain geographic areas that share the same zip code as a qualified distressed county.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1594
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page