Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Charles County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 /CH0375 (HB1072/CH0374)
Title
Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB1081)
Title
Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 /CH0760 (HB1061/CH0759)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 /CH0544 (HB1018/CH0543)
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1024)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0750 /CH0375 (HB1072/CH0374) Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 375
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0751 (HB1081) Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
SB0832 /CH0760 (HB1061/CH0759) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0833 /CH0544 (HB1018/CH0543) Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0939 (HB1024) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page