Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Energy Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163
Title
Electricity - Combined Heat and Power Systems - Metering
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 /CH0135
Title
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Eligible Borrowers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 /CH0133
Title
State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 /CH0134
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0163 Electricity - Combined Heat and Power Systems - Metering By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0170 /CH0135 Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Eligible Borrowers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0052 /CH0133 State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Finance
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0053 /CH0134 State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Finance
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM
Click to return on the top page