Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Human Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 /CH0227
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203 /CH0228
Title
Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0175 /CH0227 Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0203 /CH0228 Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0214 Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:33 AM
Click to return on the top page