Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Natural Resources, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0062 /CH0085
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063 /CH0086
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Trotlines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0065 /CH0087
Title
Tree Expert License - Application and Renewal - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0117
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0062 /CH0085 Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Licenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0063 /CH0086 Natural Resources - Fishing - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Trotlines By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0065 /CH0087 Tree Expert License - Application and Renewal - Repeal of Sunset Provision By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 /CH0117 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1506 Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page