Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Natural Resources, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0393
Title
Environmental Trust Fund - Surcharge Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 /CH0080
Title
Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Gear
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 /CH0081
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0272
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0106 /CH0393 Environmental Trust Fund - Surcharge Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0007 /CH0080 Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Gear By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2019 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 /CH0081 Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2019 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 /CH0272 Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM
Click to return on the top page