Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Planning, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0098
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Review of Capital Projects - Duties of Director
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0601
Title
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0346 /CH0098 Maryland Historical Trust - Review of Capital Projects - Duties of Director By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0510 /CH0601 Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page