Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Accountants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0535)
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381
Title
Income Tax Preparers - Grant Program - Free Application for Federal Student Aid
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1399 (SB0910)
Title
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535 (HB0553)
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1399)
Title
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059
Title
Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions and Grievance Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1112 /CH0320
Title
Income Tax - Aerospace, Electronics, or Defense Contract Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
President
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0553 (SB0535) Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1381 Income Tax Preparers - Grant Program - Free Application for Federal Student Aid Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1399 (SB0910) Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0535 (HB0553) Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 (HB1399) Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established Senator Ferguson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-45)
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1059 Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions and Grievance Procedures Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1112 /CH0320 Income Tax - Aerospace, Electronics, or Defense Contract Tax Credit Program President 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page