Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 /CH0573 (SB0473/CH0574)
Title
Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0211)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0709 (SB0215/CH0710)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0563 /CH0309 (SB0338/CH0310)
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893
Title
Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 (SB0331)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0375)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0710 (HB0549/CH0709)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0999)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 /CH0310 (HB0563/CH0309)
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0574 (HB0056/CH0573)
Title
Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 /CH0573 (SB0473/CH0574) Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave Delegate Boyce 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Economic Matters
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0375 (SB0211) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0381 Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0549 /CH0709 (SB0215/CH0710) Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0563 /CH0309 (SB0338/CH0310) Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021) Delegate Long 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0893 Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0999 (SB0331) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Health and Government Operations
SB0211 (HB0375) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0710 (HB0549/CH0709) Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0331 (HB0999) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 /CH0310 (HB0563/CH0309) Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021) Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0473 /CH0574 (HB0056/CH0573) Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page