Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061 (SB0081)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309
Title
Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831
Title
Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 (SB0956)
Title
Criminal Law – Threats to Public Officials
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081 (HB0061)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
State Building Code - Electric Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956 (HB1409)
Title
Criminal Law - Threats to Public Officials
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 (SB0081) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0309 Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Pilot Program Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0831 Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 (SB0956) Criminal Law – Threats to Public Officials Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0081 (HB0061) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0627 State Building Code - Electric Vehicles Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0956 (HB1409) Criminal Law - Threats to Public Officials Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page