Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Carroll County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0297)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689 (SB0436/CH0580)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Member Compensation
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692 /CH0277 (SB0906/CH0278)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728 (SB0371/CH0276)
Title
Carroll County – Prospective Employees and Volunteers – Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256)
Title
Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0945 /CH0275
Title
Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0605 (SB0545/CH0606)
Title
Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 (HB0339)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728)
Title
Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0580 (HB0689)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Member Compensation
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 /CH0606 (HB1182/CH0605)
Title
Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 /CH0102
Title
Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 /CH0278 (HB0692/CH0277)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009 /CH0626
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0339 (SB0297) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0689 (SB0436/CH0580) Carroll County - Board of Education - Member Compensation Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0692 /CH0277 (SB0906/CH0278) Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0728 (SB0371/CH0276) Carroll County – Prospective Employees and Volunteers – Criminal History Records Check Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Rules
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256) Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0945 /CH0275 Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1182 /CH0605 (SB0545/CH0606) Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0297 (HB0339) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728) Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0436 /CH0580 (HB0689) Carroll County - Board of Education - Member Compensation Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0545 /CH0606 (HB1182/CH0605) Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0641 /CH0102 Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Reapportionment and Redistricting
2/17/2022 - 11:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0906 /CH0278 (HB0692/CH0277) Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1009 /CH0626 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2022 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page