Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Checks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 /CH0252
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1124
Title
Scrap Metal Processor - Purchase of Scrap Metal - Hours of Operation
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0112 /CH0252 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1124 Scrap Metal Processor - Purchase of Scrap Metal - Hours of Operation Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page