Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Clams

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287 /CH0235 (SB0808)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0557)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Vessels
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0760)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 (HB0287/CH0235)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0287 /CH0235 (SB0808) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0760 (SB0557) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Vessels Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0557 (HB0760) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0808 (HB0287/CH0235) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page