Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Coastal Bays

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 /CH0461
Title
Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129
Title
BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB0266)
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0281)
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0068 /CH0461 Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0129 BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0281 (SB0266) Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 (HB0281) Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page