Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Contests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Water Supply Replacement
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0670
Title
Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0619 Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Water Supply Replacement Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0670 Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page