Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Crabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 (SB0026)
Title
State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 (HB0013)
Title
State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0173
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 (SB0026) State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0026 (HB0013) State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich Senator Colburn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0059 /CH0173 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page