Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 /CH0166 (SB0134/CH0165)
Title
Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 (SB0136)
Title
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0621
Title
Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit Court
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 /CH0632
Title
Cecil County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 /CH0302
Title
Calvert County - Assistant Sheriff - Salary and Status
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1556 (SB1128/CH0712)
Title
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0165 (HB0148/CH0166)
Title
Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136 (HB0152)
Title
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0052
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1106 /CH0467
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1128 /CH0712 (HB1556)
Title
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0148 /CH0166 (SB0134/CH0165) Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0152 (SB0136) Somerset County - State's Attorney - Salary Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0447 /CH0621 Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit Court Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 /CH0632 Cecil County - Sheriff - Salary Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 /CH0302 Calvert County - Assistant Sheriff - Salary and Status Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1556 (SB1128/CH0712) Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining Delegate Folden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Rules
SB0134 /CH0165 (HB0148/CH0166) Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0136 (HB0152) Somerset County - State's Attorney - Salary Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0146 /CH0052 Harford County - State's Attorney - Salary Harford County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1106 /CH0467 Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1128 /CH0712 (HB1556) Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Finance
3/18/2016 - 12:30 PM
Appropriations
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page