Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Deaf Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189 (SB0097)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Veditz Center of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0178
Title
Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 (HB1189)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Veditz Center of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1189 (SB0097) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Veditz Center of Maryland Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0083 /CH0178 Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 (HB1189) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Veditz Center of Maryland Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page