Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Dogs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501
Title
Crimes - Unattended Restraint of Dogs in Extreme Temperatures
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 /CH0465
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 /CH0466
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647
Title
Insurance - Homeowner's and Renter's Policies - Dog Breed Discrimination
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0501 Crimes - Unattended Restraint of Dogs in Extreme Temperatures Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 /CH0465 Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0124 /CH0466 Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0647 Insurance - Homeowner's and Renter's Policies - Dog Breed Discrimination Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page