Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Definition of Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561 (SB0017/CH0351)
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Domestic Violence - Protective Orders - Status Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 (SB0849)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision-Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 (SB0336)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141)
Title
Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 /CH0351 (HB0561)
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031
Title
Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB1407)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429)
Title
Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB1168)
Title
Child Custody – Legal Decision–Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898
Title
Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program and Guarantee Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0338 Child Abuse and Neglect - Definition of Neglect Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0561 (SB0017/CH0351) Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0639 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Domestic Violence - Protective Orders - Status Hearings Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 (SB0849) Child Custody - Legal Decision-Making and Parenting Time Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1407 (SB0336) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141) Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0017 /CH0351 (HB0561) Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0336 (HB1407) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429) Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 (HB1168) Child Custody – Legal Decision–Making and Parenting Time Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program and Guarantee Fund Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 4:51 PM
Click to return on the top page