Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Dorchester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264
Title
Dorchester County - Authorized Use of Highway User Revenues - Highway Lighting
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092 (SB0821)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 (SB0956)
Title
Dorchester County Board of Education - Nonprofessional Personnel Appointment - Advice and Consent
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Supermarket License
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1092)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956 (HB1217)
Title
Dorchester County Board of Education - Nonprofessional Personnel Appointment - Advice and Consent
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1108
Title
Foreclosures - Dorchester County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0264 Dorchester County - Authorized Use of Highway User Revenues - Highway Lighting Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1092 (SB0821) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1111 (SB0953) Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1217 (SB0956) Dorchester County Board of Education - Nonprofessional Personnel Appointment - Advice and Consent Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0621 Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Supermarket License Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0821 (HB1092) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0956 (HB1217) Dorchester County Board of Education - Nonprofessional Personnel Appointment - Advice and Consent Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1108 Foreclosures - Dorchester County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page