Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Engineers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 (SB0292/CH0051)
Title
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0345
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315
Title
Minority Business Participation - Liquidated Damages Provisions - Exclusion for Architectural and Engineering Services Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292 /CH0051 (HB0253)
Title
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 /CH0494
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0253 (SB0292/CH0051) State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0345 Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1315 Minority Business Participation - Liquidated Damages Provisions - Exclusion for Architectural and Engineering Services Contracts Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 /CH0051 (HB0253) State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0401 /CH0494 Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page