Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Estate Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB0913)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847
Title
Estate Tax - Exclusion Amount
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB1229)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0522 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 (SB0913) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0847 Estate Tax - Exclusion Amount President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0913 (HB1229) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page