Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Facsimile Transmission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219
Title
Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0450/CH0035)
Title
Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for Submission
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 /CH0035 (HB0660)
Title
Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for Submission
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0219 Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0596 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 (SB0450/CH0035) Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for Submission Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 /CH0035 (HB0660) Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for Submission Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page