Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Food Stamps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101 (SB0913)
Title
Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881
Title
Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB0101)
Title
Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0101 (SB0913) Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1233 Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2021) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0881 Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0913 (HB0101) Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 6:31 PM
Click to return on the top page