Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Foster Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 /CH0573 (SB0473/CH0574)
Title
Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0197 (SB0448/CH0198)
Title
County Boards of Education – Student Transportation – Vehicles and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216 /CH0256 (SB0155/CH0257)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 /CH0315 (SB0592/CH0316)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0211)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893
Title
Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998
Title
County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067 (SB0538)
Title
Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 /CH0481 (SB0520/CH0482)
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0257 (HB0216/CH0256)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0375)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0198 (HB0072/CH0197)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0574 (HB0056/CH0573)
Title
Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0482 (HB1243/CH0481)
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB1067)
Title
Community Colleges and Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0316 (HB0258/CH0315)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 /CH0573 (SB0473/CH0574) Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave Delegate Boyce 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Economic Matters
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0072 /CH0197 (SB0448/CH0198) County Boards of Education – Student Transportation – Vehicles and Report Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Ways and Means
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0216 /CH0256 (SB0155/CH0257) Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0258 /CH0315 (SB0592/CH0316) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0375 (SB0211) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0381 Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0893 Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0998 County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1067 (SB0538) Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1243 /CH0481 (SB0520/CH0482) Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0155 /CH0257 (HB0216/CH0256) Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0211 (HB0375) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0448 /CH0198 (HB0072/CH0197) County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0473 /CH0574 (HB0056/CH0573) Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0520 /CH0482 (HB1243/CH0481) Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0538 (HB1067) Community Colleges and Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0592 /CH0316 (HB0258/CH0315) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page