Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Group Homes -see also- Assisted Living

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0960 /CH0439 (SB0853/CH0438)
Title
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380 (SB0850)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Shelter
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476 /CH0699 (SB0797/CH0698)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1512 (SB1022)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102
Title
Governor's Office for Children and Services to Children
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 /CH0698 (HB1476/CH0699)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB1380)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Shelter
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0438 (HB0960/CH0439)
Title
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1022 (HB1512)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0960 /CH0439 (SB0853/CH0438) Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1380 (SB0850) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Shelter Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB1476 /CH0699 (SB0797/CH0698) Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1512 (SB1022) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0102 Governor's Office for Children and Services to Children Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) Adopted
Finance
1/20/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0797 /CH0698 (HB1476/CH0699) Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding Senator Pugh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 698
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0850 (HB1380) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Shelter Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
SB0853 /CH0438 (HB0960/CH0439) Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1022 (HB1512) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page