Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Hospices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276
Title
Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0891)
Title
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 (HB1112)
Title
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0276 Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2021 - 3:45 PM
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1112 (SB0891) Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
SB0891 (HB1112) Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2021 9:12 PM
Click to return on the top page