Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Health Maintenance Organizations (J4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0509 (SB0617/CH0508)
Title
Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0808 (SB0680)
Title
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 /CH0508 (HB0716/CH0509)
Title
Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB0808)
Title
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation Claims
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0716 /CH0509 (SB0617/CH0508) Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist Agreements Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0808 (SB0680) Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation Claims Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0617 /CH0508 (HB0716/CH0509) Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist Agreements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0680 (HB0808) Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation Claims Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page