Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Land Preservation Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Delegate Jones 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page