Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

License Plates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088
Title
Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179
Title
Vehicle Laws - Chesapeake Bay Commemorative Registration Plates - Truck Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392 (SB0274)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Vehicle Manufactured Without Means to Display Front Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and Pollinators
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345
Title
Public Safety - Police Profiling - "Right-to-Carry" Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0392)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769
Title
Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems and Speed Monitoring Systems - Continuous Audits
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0179 Vehicle Laws - Chesapeake Bay Commemorative Registration Plates - Truck Eligibility Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0392 (SB0274) Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0425 Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Vehicle Manufactured Without Means to Display Front Plate Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1102 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and Pollinators Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1345 Public Safety - Police Profiling - "Right-to-Carry" Permit Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0392) Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0769 Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems and Speed Monitoring Systems - Continuous Audits Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM
Click to return on the top page