Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Lieutenant Governor

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Election Law – State Officials – Recall Election
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1058
Title
Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831
Title
Election Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0985 Election Law – State Officials – Recall Election Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1058 Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 Election Reform Act of 2021 Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page