Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Mandatory Retirement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 (SB0103/CH0150)
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0150 (HB0077)
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment
Sponsor
Senator Peters
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 (SB0103/CH0150) Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
HB0380 State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - Exception Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0103 /CH0150 (HB0077) Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment Senator Peters 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Senator Miller 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page