Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 /CH0393 (SB0942/CH0394)
Title
Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830/CH0574)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242 (SB0826/CH0384)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Returning to State Meat Processing Inspection (Farms Buy Local Act)
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 /CH0384 (HB1242)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 /CH0574 (HB1228/CH0030)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 /CH0394 (HB0855/CH0393)
Title
Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0855 /CH0393 (SB0942/CH0394) Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment Delegate Boyce 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830/CH0574) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1242 (SB0826/CH0384) Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Ways and Means
SB0039 Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Returning to State Meat Processing Inspection (Farms Buy Local Act) Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0826 /CH0384 (HB1242) Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
SB0830 /CH0574 (HB1228/CH0030) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0942 /CH0394 (HB0855/CH0393) Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page