Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Medical Schools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 (SB0990)
Title
Medical Schools - Use of Animals in Medical Training - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 (SB0324/CH0013)
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0013 (HB0309)
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990 (HB0289)
Title
Medical Schools - Use of Animals in Medical Training - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0289 (SB0990) Medical Schools - Use of Animals in Medical Training - Prohibited Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0309 (SB0324/CH0013) Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016 Delegate Busch 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0324 /CH0013 (HB0309) Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016 Senator Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0990 (HB0289) Medical Schools - Use of Animals in Medical Training - Prohibited Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page